US SB258 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Withdraws approximately 309,272 acres of National Forest System land in the Ruby Mountains subdistrict of the Humboldt-Toiyabe National Forest located in Elko and White Pine Counties, Nevada, from operation under mineral leasing laws. Any land within the withdrawal area that is acquired by the federal government after enactment of this bill must be withdrawn in accordance with the bill.
Title
Ruby Mountains Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Nevada
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Nevada
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources