US SB2586 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish specified grant programs to support positive maternal health care outcomes for pregnant and postpartum women and their infants. Specifically, grants must be used to (1) develop best practices to reduce preventable maternal mortality, (2) train health care professionals to reduce and prevent adiscrimination when providing maternal health services, and (3) support the collaboration of professionals across health settings with respect to maternal health. Grants may also be used to establish evidence-informed, integrated health care services to pregnant and postpartum women and their infants.HHS also must contract with an independent research organization to study and make recommendations about best practices for reducing and preventing discrimination in the provision of maternal health services and meet certain reporting requirements for specified maternal and child health care grant programs.
Title
MOM Act Maternal Outcomes Matter Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4215 (Related) 2019-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4995 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB4995 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Medical education
Minority health
Nursing
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Medical education
Minority health
Nursing
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2586/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2586/BILLS-116s2586is.pdf |