US SB2587 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends funding through FY2023 for (1) the Promoting Safe and Stable Families Program, and (2) a formula-based grant program to improve foster-care and adoption proceedings in state courts. In addition, the bill makes changes to the latter program, including by requiring grantees to expend a portion of funds on data collection and data sharing activities and by reserving funding for a competitive grant program for tribal courts.
Title
COURTS Act Continuation Of Useful Resources To States Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2702 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4514 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB4602 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
SB1376 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4172 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4514 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB4602 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
SB1376 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4172 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Child safety and welfare
Indian social and development programs
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local courts
Child safety and welfare
Indian social and development programs
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local courts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2587/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2587/BILLS-116s2587is.pdf |