US SB2603 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5843-5845)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5843-5845)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to end the immigrant visa backlog, and for other purposes.
Title
RELIEF Act Resolving Extended Limbo for Immigrant Employees and Families Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5843-5845) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1044 (Related) 2020-12-03 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB386 (Related) 2019-07-09 - S.Amdt.906 Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5327 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB386 (Related) 2019-07-09 - S.Amdt.906 Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5327 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Citizenship and naturalization
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Marriage and family status
Visas and passports
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Marriage and family status
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2603/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2603/BILLS-116s2603is.pdf |