US SB2610 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 612.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 612.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize certain programs under the Office of Indian Energy Policy and Programs of the Department of Energy, and for other purposes.
Title
Tribal Energy Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 612. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-310. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-198. |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Arctic and polar regions
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Federal-Indian relations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Public utilities and utility rates
Air quality
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Arctic and polar regions
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Federal-Indian relations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Public utilities and utility rates