US SB2619 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and reauthorizes through FY2024 the Healthy Start program, which provides grants that support interventions to improve women’s health before, during, and after pregnancy. Further, the bill requires the Health Resources and Services Administration to consider communities with high rates of infant mortality when awarding grants and requires the Government Accountability Office to evaluate the program’s health outcomes.
Title
Healthy Start Reauthorization Act of 2019 Heathy Start Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 288. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4801 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Performance measurement
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Performance measurement
Women's health