US SB2668 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Energy to establish a grant program to research, develop, evaluate, and commercialize solar energy technologies and systems.
Title
Solar Energy Research and Development Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-202. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 358. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3597 (Related) 2020-09-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 400.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Alternative and renewable resources
Chemistry
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Materials
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Technology transfer and commercialization
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Alternative and renewable resources
Chemistry
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Materials
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Technology transfer and commercialization
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection