US SB2683 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-242. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-242. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Aviation Administration Veteran Transition Improvement Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill applies federal civil service requirements to leave used by disabled armed forces veterans in the personnel management system of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA). To verify that leave credited to such an employee is used for treating a service-connected disability, the employee shall certify to FAA Human Resource Management that the employee used that leave for purposes of being furnished treatment for that disability by a health care provider.
Title
Federal Aviation Administration Veteran Transition Improvement Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-07 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-242. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-10-07 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-09-29 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-09-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-27 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5946) |
2016-09-27 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5946) |
2016-09-27 | House | Mr. LoBiondo asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2016-09-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-09-22 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-09-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6064) |
2016-09-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.5091 Amendment SA 5091 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.5091 Amendment SA 5091 proposed by Senator Coats for Senator Hirono. |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6064) |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB636 (Related) 2016-07-15 - Became Public Law No: 114-190. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Disability and paralysis
Employee leave
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Department of Transportation
Disability and paralysis
Employee leave
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care