US SB2683 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2020-03-09HouseReceived in the House.
2020-03-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1612)
2020-03-05SenateS.Amdt.1522 Amendment SA 1522 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-05SenateS.Amdt.1522 Amendment SA 1522 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S1611-1612; text: CR S1612) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-03-05SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-05SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1611-1612)
2019-12-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 370.
2019-12-17SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-12-12SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-10-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB3986 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB1408 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback