US SB2701 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the entire category of fentanyl-related substances to schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. A schedule I controlled substance is a drug, substance, or chemical that has a high potential for abuse; has no currently accepted medical value; and is subject to regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Federal Initiative to Guarantee Health by Targeting Fentanyl Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5421 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB3193 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 405.
HB5771 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5421 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB3193 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 405.
HB5771 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2701/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2701/BILLS-116s2701is.pdf |