US SB2702 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-199.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-199.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish an integrated energy systems program to (1) maximize energy production and efficiency; (2) develop energy systems involving the integration of nuclear energy with renewable energy, fossil energy, and energy storage; and (3) expand the use of emissions-reducing energy technologies into nonelectric sectors to achieve significant reductions in environmental emissions. DOE must establish quantitative goals and milestones for the program.
Title
Integrated Energy Systems Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-199. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 360. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7247 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Manufacturing
Motor fuels
Nuclear power
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Water use and supply
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Manufacturing
Motor fuels
Nuclear power
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Water use and supply