US SB2710 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-77. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-77. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President to prohibit the issuance of licenses to export specified munitions items to the Hong Kong Police Force and the Hong Kong Auxiliary Police Force. The specified items include tear gas, rubber bullets, and handcuffs. The President may make an exception upon certifying to Congress as to how such exports are important to U.S. national interests and foreign policy goals. This prohibition shall expire one year after the bill's enactment.
Title
A bill to prohibit the commercial export of covered munitions items to the Hong Kong Police Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 636 (Y: 417 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-77. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 636). (text: CR H9096) |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9100-9101) |
2019-11-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2710. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9096-9098) |
2019-11-20 | House | Mr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-11-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6661) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1248 Amendment SA 1248 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1247 Amendment SA 1247 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1248 Amendment SA 1248 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S6661; text: CR S6661) To provide a one-year sunset. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1247 Amendment SA 1247 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S6661; text: CR S6661) To include the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs of the Senate as part of the notification requirement. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6661) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Subjects
China
Congressional oversight
Hong Kong
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Protest and dissent
Trade restrictions
Congressional oversight
Hong Kong
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Protest and dissent
Trade restrictions