US SB2774 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Justice to establish a Veterans Treatment Court Program to provide grants and technical assistance for state, local, and tribal governments to develop and maintain veterans treatment courts.
Title
Veteran Treatment Court Coordination Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7120-7121) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7120-7121) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB886 (Related) 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-153. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local courts
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local courts
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care