US SB279 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 135.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tribal School Federal Insurance Parity Act This bill allows schools that receive grants under the Tribally Controlled Schools Act of 1988 to participate in the Federal Employee Health Benefits program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tribal School Federal Insurance Parity Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 135.
2019-07-09SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-54.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-01SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-01-30SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB895 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback