US SB2799 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements concerning the energy-water nexus, which means the links between (1) the water needed to produce fuels, electricity, and other forms of energy; and (2) the energy needed to transport, reclaim, and treat water and wastewater. Specifically, the bill requires the Department of the Energy (DOE) and the Department of the Interior to establish a joint Nexus of Energy and Water for Sustainability (NEWS) Office and Interagency Coordination Committee on NEWS to plan for and coordinate energy-water nexus research, development, and demonstration activities. In addition, DOE must establish and carry out a smart energy and water efficiency management pilot program. Under the program, DOE must award grants to water authorities (i.e., authorities that provide water, wastewater, or water reuse services) for demonstrating unique, advanced, or innovative technology-based solutions that will improve the net energy balance of water, wastewater, and water reuse systems; support the implementation of innovative and unique processes and the installation of established, advanced automated systems that provide real-time data on energy and water; and improve energy-water conservation and quality and predictive maintenance through technologies that utilize internet-connected technologies.
Title
NEWS Act of 2019 Nexus of Energy and Water for Sustainability Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-198. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 362. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2019 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB2665 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2665 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Department of the Interior
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Internet and video services
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Department of the Interior
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Internet and video services
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply