US SB28 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through 2022 arrangements that allow certain defense articles to be transferred to Jordan on an expedited basis. The bill also directs the President to submit a report to Congress assessing the costs and benefits of establishing a fund to support private investment in Jordan.
Title
United States-Jordan Defense Cooperation Extension Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S27) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Held at the desk.
HB336 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
HB4862 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HB336 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
HB4862 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Jordan
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Public-private cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Syria
U.S. and foreign investments
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Jordan
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Public-private cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Syria
U.S. and foreign investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/28/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s28/BILLS-116s28pcs.pdf |