US SB2800 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018 This bill requires the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, each fiscal year, to submit to Congress a five-year budget and work plan for projects of national significance. Each Corps of Engineers district, each fiscal year, must submit a five-year budget and work plan for projects under its jurisdiction. Projects must be carried out in a sustainable manner that focuses on water resource challenges and opportunities, promotes collaboration, and pursues integrated water resource management. The bill reauthorizes provisions of the Water Resources Reform and Development Act of 2014 pertaining to expedited consideration of water resources infrastructure through 2024. The bill provides for: (1) the establishment of a Corps of Engineers Board of Appeals; and (2) various studies, modifications, and project authorizations and deauthorizations nationwide. The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) shall establish a voluntary stormwater infrastructure funding task force to develop recommendations to improve the funding and financing of stormwater infrastructure. The Safe Drinking Water Act is amended to establish a voluntary WaterSense program to identify and promote water-efficient products, buildings, landscapes, facilities, processes, and services. The Water Infrastructure Finance and Innovation Act of 2014 is amended to authorize the EPA to provide financial assistance to state infrastructure financing authorities for state loan funds to carry out water and wastewater infrastructure projects. The EPA shall: (1) promote the use of green infrastructure; (2) carry out a Water Infrastructure Resiliency and Sustainability Program; and (3) appoint at least one employee in each regional office to serve as a liaison to minority, tribal, and low-income communities.
Title
America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 425. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-304. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1674 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB2355 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB692 (Related) 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB5726 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5827 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB6804 (Related) 2018-10-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB648 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 390.
HB1971 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5030 (Related) 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB199 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
SB518 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89.
HB2355 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB692 (Related) 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB5726 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5827 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB6804 (Related) 2018-10-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB648 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 390.
HB1971 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5030 (Related) 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB199 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
SB518 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Dams and canals
Ecology
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Long Island Sound
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
New York State
Public utilities and utility rates
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Seashores and lakeshores
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Texas
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming
Connecticut
Dams and canals
Ecology
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Long Island Sound
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
New York State
Public utilities and utility rates
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Seashores and lakeshores
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Texas
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming