US SB2827 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to establish the U.S. African-American Burial Grounds Network within the National Park Service (NPS). In carrying out the network, Interior, among other things, must review existing and new studies and reports to inform consideration of sites for the network; furnish specified technical assistance; develop a program to train states, units of local government, regional governmental bodies, organizations, educational institutions, and private entities to carry out the purposes of this bill; and produce and disseminate educational and training materials related to African-American burial ground identification methods and best practices for caring for artifacts,developing interpretive tours and exhibits, preserving burial ground landscapes, heritage tourism initiatives and sources for grants (e.g., handbooks, maps, interpretive guides, or electronic information). A burial ground shall only be considered for addition to the network with the property owner's consent and at the request of an individual, landowner, private or nonprofit organization, state or local government, or another entity.
Title
African American Burial Grounds Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2722 Amendment SA 2722 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2722 Amendment SA 2722 proposed by Senator Brown. (consideration: CR S7859; text: CR S7859) To amend the title. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7859) |
2020-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2721 Amendment SA 2721 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2721 Amendment SA 2721 proposed by Senator Brown. (consideration: CR S7859; text: CR S7859) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7859) |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1179 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Research administration and funding
U.S. history
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Research administration and funding
U.S. history