US SB2831 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 655.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 655.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Golden Spike 150th Anniversary Act
Title
Golden Spike 150th Anniversary Act
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 655. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-368. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5751 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
U.S. history
Utah
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
U.S. history
Utah