US SB2863 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

National Law Enforcement Museum Commemorative Coin Act This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 400,000 $1 silver coins, and 750,000 half-dollar clad coins that are emblematic of the National Law Enforcement Museum in Washington, DC, and the service and sacrifice of law enforcement officers throughout the history of the United States. All sales of such coins shall include specified surcharges, which shall be distributed to the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial Fund, Inc., for educational and outreach programs and exhibits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Law Enforcement Museum Commemorative Coin Act

Sponsors

Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND]
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN]Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]
Sen. James Risch [R-ID]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT]Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV]Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-19HouseHeld at the desk.
2018-12-19HouseReceived in the House.
2018-12-17SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-12-13SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S7623-7624)
2018-12-13SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7623-7624)
2018-05-16SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB4732 (Same As) 2017-12-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback