US SB2873 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Puerto Rico Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Puerto Rico Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1366 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5178 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
SB154 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
SB484 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Held at the desk.
HB2056 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB526 (Related) 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-452.
HB5975 (Same As) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4319 (Related) 2017-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback