US SB2876 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pike National Historic Trail Study Act
Title
Pike National Historic Trail Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 658. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-371. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Colorado
Historic sites and heritage areas
Kansas
Louisiana
Military history
Missouri
Nebraska
New Mexico
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Historic sites and heritage areas
Kansas
Louisiana
Military history
Missouri
Nebraska
New Mexico
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources