US SB2891 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of wildlife corridors on Indian land to provide habitat or ecological connectivity and allow for fish, wildlife, or plant movement on such land. Specifically, the bill permits an Indian tribe to nominate a corridor within the land of such tribe as a tribal wildlife corridor. The Department of the Interior must establish criteria for determining whether such a corridor qualifies as a tribal wildlife corridor, including criteria for restoring historical habitat. Interior must provide tribes with technical assistance to establish, manage, or expand a tribal wildlife corridor. Such assistance must include support with accessing wildlife data and working with private landowners to access programs for facilitating connectivity on nonfederal land. Additionally, Interior must (1) establish a program to award grants to tribes to increase connectivity through tribal wildlife corridors, and (2) consult with tribes to determine whether a tribal wildlife corridor may be expanded into public lands or otherwise benefit connectivity between public lands and such corridor. The bill also permits the Department of Agriculture to give priority under certain conservation programs to those projects that enhance connectivity by expanding a tribal wildlife corridor.
Title
Tribal Wildlife Corridors Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-305. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-198. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5179 (Same As) 2020-10-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
HB2795 (Related) 2020-10-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456.
SB1499 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2795 (Related) 2020-10-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456.
SB1499 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Native Americans
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Government information and archives
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Native Americans
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection