US SB2898 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain air traffic controllers from a required reduction in their retirement annuity payment on account of earnings from certain work performed while entitled to such annuity. Under current law, retired Federal Aviation Administration air traffic controllers receive an annuity payment during the period between the mandatory retirement age of 56 and the social security minimum age of 62. Such annuity payment is required to be reduced by a certain percentage of any excess earnings during this period. The bill exempts from such reduction in annuity payments an air traffic controller who participates in the Air Traffic Control Contract Program (a public-private partnership for air traffic control services) following mandatory retirement.
Title
CONTRACT Act of 2019 Continuity for Operators with Necessary Training Required for ATC Contract Towers Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 526. |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-263. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5297 (Same As) 2019-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB785 (Related) 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-171. (TXT | PDF)
SB785 (Related) 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-171. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Transportation employees
Department of Transportation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Transportation employees