US SB291 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to implement a mobility demonstration program to enable public housing agencies (PHAs) to administer housing-choice rental-assistance vouchers in a manner designed to (1) encourage low-income families receiving such assistance to move to lower-poverty areas, and (2) expand access to opportunity areas. HUD shall require PHAs applying to participate in the program to submit a specified Regional Housing Mobility Plan.
Title
Housing Choice Voucher Mobility Demonstration Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB648 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
HB1122 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
HB1122 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
User charges and fees
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/291/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s291/BILLS-116s291is.pdf |