US SB2912 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to take the 55.3 acres of land of the Blackwater Trading Post in Pinal County, Arizona, which is bordered and owned by the Gila River Indian Community, into trust for the benefit of the community after it (1) conveys to Interior all of its interest in such land, and (2) submits a request for Interior to take such land into trust for it. The land that is taken into trust shall be treated as part of the community's reservation. The bill prohibits gaming on any of the land taken into trust.
Title
Blackwater Trading Post Land Transfer Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-270. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3160 (Same As) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate.