US SB292 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S802-803)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S802-803)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the separation of families at or near U.S. borders or ports of entry. The Departments of Homeland Security (DHS), Justice, and Health and Human Services shall not separate a child from a parent or legal guardian at a port of entry or within 100 miles of a U.S. border unless a state court terminates the parent or legal guardian's rights; a state child welfare agency or court determines it is in the child's best interests to be removed; or the child is determined to be a trafficking victim or at risk of becoming one, the accompanying adult is most likely not the parent or legal guardian, or the child is in danger of abuse or neglect. An agency may not separate a child from a parent or legal guardian solely to deter migration into the United States or to promote compliance with immigration laws. DHS shall develop (1) training related to the bill's family separation requirements, and (2) guidance for how parents and legal guardians may locate a separated child. DHS shall provide parents and legal guardians periodic status updates about a separated child. The Government Accountability Office shall report to Congress on the criminal prosecution of asylum seekers.
Title
Keep Families Together Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S802-803) |
Same As/Similar To
HB541 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB1733 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3256; text: CR S2356-3258)
SB2113 (Related) 2019-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3918 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB9040 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1733 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3256; text: CR S2356-3258)
SB2113 (Related) 2019-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3918 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB9040 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family relationships
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement officers
Public contracts and procurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family relationships
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement officers
Public contracts and procurement
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Separation, divorce, custody, support
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/292/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s292/BILLS-116s292is.pdf |