US SB294 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 64.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Native American Business Incubators Program Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native American Business Incubators Program Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 64.
2019-04-08SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-29.
2019-02-06SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-31SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1900 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback