US SB2945 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 171 South Maple Street in Dana, Indiana, as the Ernest "Ernie" T. Pyle Post Office.
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 171 South Maple Street in Dana, Indiana, as the Ernest "Ernie" T. Pyle Post Office.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 442. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4734 (Same As) 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-200. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
News media and reporting
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
News media and reporting
Postal service