US SB2954 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Guardians of America's Freedom Medal Act
Title
Guardians of America's Freedom Medal Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB2211 (Same As) 2017-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2211 (Same As) 2017-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2954/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2954/BILLS-115s2954is.pdf |