US SB2997 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises and extends through FY2025 specified health profession workforce development programs and requires the Department of Health and Human Services to develop a plan to coordinate such programs.
Title
Title VII Health Care Workforce Act of 2019 Title VII Health Care Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 372. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6906) |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aging
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Medical education
Minority education
Minority employment
Minority health
Performance measurement
Rural conditions and development
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's health
Aging
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Medical education
Minority education
Minority employment
Minority health
Performance measurement
Rural conditions and development
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's health