US SB3001 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several health care taxes (e.g., repeals the medical device excise tax) and temporarily extends several Medicare, Medicaid, and public health programs (e.g., outreach and enrollment programs). The bill also renames the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program as the Jobs and Opportunity with Benefits and Services program, reauthorizes the program through FY2024, and makes changes relating to work requirements for beneficiaries.
Title
Permanent Relief for Seniors and Medicare, Medicaid, Human Services Extension Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1413 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1469 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1473 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1490 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1505 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1753 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB3039 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3074 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3421 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3445 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB110 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB172 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB802 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1469 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1473 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1490 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1505 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1753 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB3039 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3074 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3421 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3445 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB110 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB172 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB802 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Employment and training programs
Family relationships
Family services
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Income tax deductions
Indian social and development programs
Insurance industry and regulation
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Marriage and family status
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Sales and excise taxes
Sex and reproductive health
State and local finance
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Employment and training programs
Family relationships
Family services
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Income tax deductions
Indian social and development programs
Insurance industry and regulation
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Marriage and family status
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Sales and excise taxes
Sex and reproductive health
State and local finance
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3001/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3001/BILLS-116s3001is.pdf |