US SB3016 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Action for Dental Health Act of 2018
Title
Action for Dental Health Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2422 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-302.