US SB3044 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 609.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 609.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the American's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018 to expand the Indian reservation drinking water program, and for other purposes.
Title
Western Tribal Water Infrastructure Act of 2019 Western Tribal Water Infrastructure Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 609. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-309. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |