US SB3076 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Releases certain reversionary interest in land to Tennessee and adds additional lands to the Rough Mountain Wilderness and the Rich Hole Wilderness in Virginia. (Sec. 1) Upon the transfer of ownership of the approximately 0.90-acre parcel of land identified as the Webb property to Tennessee for inclusion in the Chickasaw State Forest and the transfer of the approximately 0.62-acre parcel of land identified as state forest land to Tennessee or a non-state entity, the Department of Agriculture (USDA) shall release to Tennessee the reversionary interest of the United States in the state forest land that requires the land to be used for public purposes.After such actions, USDA shall offer to sell to Tennessee the undivided mineral interests of the United States in the state forest land. (Sec. 2) The bill adds specified lands in the George Washington National Forest to the Rough Mountain Wilderness and the Rich Hole Wilderness. Until the additional land is incorporated into the Rich Hole Wilderness, USDA may use motorized equipment and mechanized transport in the addition for activities to improve water quality and aquatic passage.
Title
An original bill to release a federal reversionary interest in Chester County, Tennessee, to manage certain Federal land in Bath County, Virginia, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-01-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S26-27; text: CR S26-27) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 377. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Roberts. Without written report. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1563 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB247 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S700-701)
SB644 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB247 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S700-701)
SB644 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Fishes
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Mining
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Virginia
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Mining
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Virginia
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats