US SB3084 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 116-146. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 116-146. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes certain appointed positions within the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) from current executive schedule salary caps. Specifically, the current salary caps do not apply for (1) appointed directors of VA medical centers, (2) appointed directors of Veterans Integrated Service Networks, and (3) appointees of the Office of the Under Secretary for Health. The bill authorizes the VA to waive the salary limitations on such employees who were appointed during the period beginning on November 1, 2010, and ending on the day before the enactment of this bill.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to modify the limitation on pay for certain high-level employees and officers of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-146. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 3084 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2769) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate vitiated previous action of 06/04/2020 by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2745) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 3084 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2745) |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-05-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-05-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2329) |
2020-05-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3084. |
2020-05-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2329-2330) |
2020-05-28 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-01-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S262) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S262) |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6528 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Veterans' medical care