US SB3100 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey specified property in Anchorage, Alaska, to the Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium for use in connection with health programs. Such conveyance shall not require any consideration from, or impose any obligation, term, or condition on, the consortium or allow for any U.S. reversionary interest in the property. The consortium shall not be liable for any environmental contamination that occurred before such conveyance. Further, HHS shall not be liable for any environmental contamination from the date on which the consortium assumes control of, occupies, and uses the property.
Title
Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium Land Transfer Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7867; text: CR S7867) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 576. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-282. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7119 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Native Americans
Pollution liability
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Native Americans
Pollution liability