US SB3129 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and modifies several requirements to address prescription drug prices under Medicare. The bill generally limits payment amounts for drugs and biologics under Medicare medical services, reduces cost-sharing under the Medicare prescription drug benefit, and establishes several reporting requirements for drug manufacturers with respect to drug prices.
Title
Lower Costs, More Cures Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1264 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1781 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1922 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559.
HB2073 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2087 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2115 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2209 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
HB3029 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3408 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3415 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4649 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8607)
SB801 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1505 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1999 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2051 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2911 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3013 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3942 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7877 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB1781 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1922 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559.
HB2073 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2087 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2115 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2209 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
HB3029 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3408 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3415 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4649 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8607)
SB801 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1505 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1999 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2051 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2911 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3013 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3942 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7877 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3129/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3129/BILLS-116s3129is.pdf |