US SB3137 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 667.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reforming Government Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reforming Government Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-26SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 667.
2018-11-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-381.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2018-06-26SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB6787 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback