US SB3159 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

No War Against Iran Act This bill prohibits the obligation or expenditure of federal funds for any use of military force in or against Iran unless Congress has either declared war or enacted specific statutory authorization for such use. An exception is made for a presidential exercise of power to introduce Armed Forces into hostilities (or situations where imminent involvement in hostilities is clearly indicated) when there is a national emergency created by an attack upon the United States. The bill further states that no prior authorizations of military force (e.g., against Iraq) may be construed to authorize the use of military force against Iran.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No War Against Iran Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB5543 (Related) 2020-01-07 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92.
HB550 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback