US SB3165 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interagency Committee on Women's Business Enterprise Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interagency Committee on Women's Business Enterprise Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.

Same As/Similar To

HB6610 (Same As) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB5785 (Related) 2018-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback