US SB3174 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements related to the safety, sale, and advertisement of tobacco products, including electronic nicotine delivery systems (e.g., e-cigarettes, e-hookah, e-cigars, and vape pens). Among other requirements, the bill requires the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to implement regulations to require color graphics on the labeling of cigarette packages, depicting the negative health consequences of smoking; requires the FDA to apply regulations on tobacco products to all tobacco products, including e-cigarettes; prohibits the retail online sale of tobacco products, including electronic nicotine delivery systems; prohibits flavors other than tobacco in a tobacco product; prohibits the use of flavored products in an electronic nicotine delivery system, except in specified circumstances; increases the user fees that the FDA collects from manufacturers and importers; directs the FDA to regulate products containing synthetic nicotine (not made or derived from tobacco); establishes a demonstration grant program to develop strategies for smoking cessation in medically underserved communities; increases civil penalties for certain violations of restrictions on the sale of tobacco products; and requires the Government Accountability Office to study e-cigarettes.
Title
Reversing the Youth Tobacco Epidemic Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2339 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3223 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR866 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3223 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR866 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Marketing and advertising
Mental health
Minority health
Racial and ethnic relations
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Marketing and advertising
Mental health
Minority health
Racial and ethnic relations
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3174/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3174/BILLS-116s3174is.pdf |