US SB3224 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Homeowners and Military Families Tax Fairness Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) extend through 2015 the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence, (2) extend through 2012 the tax deduction for mortgage insurance premiums, and (3) exclude from gross income any National Mortgage Settlement amount. Defines "National Mortgage Settlement amount" as any amount received pursuant to the settlement in a legal action against Bank of America Corporation filed in U.S. District Court on March 12, 2012, which is: (1) a payment for transitional assistance; (2) a payment from the Borrower Payment Fund under the National Mortgage Settlement to a borrower whose home was finally sold or taken in foreclosure after December 31, 2007, and before January 1, 2012; or (3) a payment received as a result of a foreclosure that the Attorney General has determined was not in compliance with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners and Military Families Tax Fairness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB4202 (Related) 2012-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4250 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4290 (Related) 2012-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4336 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2250 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback