US SB3232 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to promote and support the local arts and creative economy in the United States.
Title
PLACE Act Promoting Local Arts and Creative Economy Workforce Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1793 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3121 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7487 (Same As) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB3121 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7487 (Same As) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3232/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3232/BILLS-116s3232is.pdf |