US SB3235 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to conduct a two-year pilot program to study the effectiveness of nonprofit post-traumatic growth programs to determine (1) the outcomes of such programs in contrast to traditional models of mental health care, (2) the possible integration of such nonprofit programs into VA mental health care programs, and (3) the budgetary impact of such integration. Post-traumatic growth is the positive psychological change that can result from struggling with traumatic events. The bill makes veterans who are not at immediate risk of attempting suicide and not participating in traditional mental health treatment eligible for such program.
Title
Veterans Posttraumatic Growth Act Veterans Posttraumatic Growth Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543. |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1997 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Mental health
Neurological disorders
Rural conditions and development
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Mental health
Neurological disorders
Rural conditions and development
Veterans' medical care