US SB3245 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to advance STEM education, provide for improved worker training, retention, and advancement, and for other purposes.
Title
WORKER Act Working On Rewarding and Keeping Employees Resilient Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB399 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB1168 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4965 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB1168 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4965 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3245/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3245/BILLS-116s3245is.pdf |