US SB3263 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth requirements related to waste and recycling collection systems for a variety of products and materials, including plastics. The bill makes certain producers of products (e.g., packaging, paper, single-use products, beverage containers, or food service products) fiscally responsible for collecting, managing, and recycling or composting the products after consumer use. In addition, the bill establishes (1) minimum percentages of products that must be reused, recycled, or composted; and (2) an increasing percentage of recycled content that must be contained in beverage containers. Beginning on January 1, 2022, the bill phases out a variety of single-use products, such as plastic utensils. The bill also sets forth provisions to encourage the reduction of single-use products, including by establishing programs to refund consumers for returning beverage containers and by establishing a tax on carryout bags. The bill creates a temporary moratorium on new or expanded permits for facilities that manufacture plastics until regulations are updated to address pollution from the facilities. The Environmental Protection Agency must publish guidelines for a national standardized labeling system for recycling and composting receptacles. Producers must include labels on their products that are easy to read and indicate whether the products are recyclable, compostable, or reusable. Finally, the bill establishes limitations on the export of plastic waste to other countries.
Title
Break Free From Plastic Pollution Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5845 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3944 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3944 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alcoholic beverages
Alternative and renewable resources
Aquatic ecology
Business records
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Industrial facilities
Inflation and prices
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Marketing and advertising
Materials
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax-exempt organizations
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water use and supply
Worker safety and health
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alcoholic beverages
Alternative and renewable resources
Aquatic ecology
Business records
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Industrial facilities
Inflation and prices
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Marketing and advertising
Materials
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax-exempt organizations
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water use and supply
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3263/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3263/BILLS-116s3263is.pdf |