US SB3264 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an interagency coordination program for tribal access to broadband service and further expands broadband access on tribal land, including by setting aside certain funds for its deployment and establishing a pilot program for tribes to grant rights-of-way for the construction, maintenance, and facilitation of broadband service on their land.
Title
Bridging the Tribal Digital Divide Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5850 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Land use and conservation
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Native Americans
Public participation and lobbying
Rural conditions and development
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Land use and conservation
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Native Americans
Public participation and lobbying
Rural conditions and development
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3264/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3264/BILLS-116s3264is.pdf |