US SB3270 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-430.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-430.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elder Abuse Prevention and Prosecution Act
Title
Elder Abuse Prevention and Prosecution Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | Senate | By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-430. |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 635. |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5169-5170) |