US SB3275 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S1136)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S1136)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new criminal offense for performing or attempting to perform an abortion if the probable post-fertilization age of the fetus is 20 weeks or more. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to five years, or both. The bill provides exceptions for an abortion (1) that is necessary to save the life of the pregnant woman, or (2) when the pregnancy is the result of rape or incest. A physician who performs or attempts to perform an abortion under an exception must comply with specified requirements. A woman who undergoes a prohibited abortion may not be prosecuted for violating or conspiring to violate the provisions of this bill.
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 57 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S1136) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1129) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (CR S1062) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S1062) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1062) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 420. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB784 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB160 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB160 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Subjects
Abortion
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Women's health
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Women's health